On June 22, 2017 control block was purchased. The former officers resigned, and new officers / directors were appointed. The company then acquired and merged with Clinical & Herbal Innovations, Inc in a one for one stock exchange of 8,751,000 shares of common stock. The agreement was executed October 20th, 2017. Then On October 20, 2017 the company entered into a one-for-one Share Exchange Agreement with Clinical & Herbal Innovations, Inc. The company issued 8,751,000 shares of common stock to the registered shareholders of Clinical & Herbal Innovations. Control Block Transferred Charles O Scott – CEO, Chairman, Control Block Owner – 62.1MM Shares Common Stock (53%) Joshua M Flood – President Paul Spivak – Former CEO, Chairman, Control Block Owner – Sold 55MM shares common stock to Charles Scott on June 22nd, 2017. Mr Spivak currently still owns 3MM Shares Common Stock Mr Spivak sold the control block to Mr Scott on June 22, 2017 Float cannot be more 50-55 Mill tops. Eager to see what happens in the coming weeks and Months. $SOLI