Register for free to join our community of investors and share your ideas. You will also get access to streaming quotes, interactive charts, trades, portfolio, live options flow and more tools.
Register for free to join our community of investors and share your ideas. You will also get access to streaming quotes, interactive charts, trades, portfolio, live options flow and more tools.
Ever heard of international roaming ?
I don´t think so, but maybe there is someone who would like to call davincivirtual
in scottsdale and ask for Mr. Lipton, could be interesting.
Very interesting.
I just took a look at the Address of Dennis Lipton, it is also a virtual office.
www.davincivirtual.com/loc/us/arizona/scottsdale-virtual-offices/facility-797
There are different possibilities, they could have sold the reporting shell to some morons who
thought they could get away with that faked stuff. There is a market for reporting shells :
www.mergernetwork.com/index/public-shell-companies-for-sale/
Or they did it themselves because it is hard to sue someone who doesn´t exist. I bet that even
Mike Berry is a fake.
That´s right, and together with the shares of the 40 original shareholders, it sums up to 61,000,000
shares after the split. During the time Axent and Kosoris were responsible, not one share was trading
in the market.
And don´t forget the convertibles, if they are toxic (the terms were never filed), they could have
diluted this company to hell if it were still trading on the OTCBB.
Form S-1 9/2/2008
On October 15, 2007, we issued 6,500,000 shares of common stock to, to our President and Secretary in consideration
of $0.001 per share or a total of $6,500. We issued the foregoing restricted shares of common stock pursuant to the
exemption from registration contained in Section 4(2) of the Securities Act of 1933. No commissions were paid to
anyone in connection with the sale of the shares and general solicitation was not made to anyone. These shares were
issued in reliance on the exemption under Section 4(2) of the Securities Act of 1933, as amended (the “Act”).
These shares of our common stock qualified for exemption under Section 4(2) of the Securities Act of 1933 since the
issuance shares by us did not involve a public offering. The offering was not a “public offering” as defined in
Section 4(2) due to the insubstantial number of persons involved in the deal, size of the offering, manner of the
offering and number of shares offered. We did not undertake an offering in which we sold a high number of shares to
a high number of investors. In addition, the shareholder had the necessary investment intent as required by
Section 4(2) since they agreed to and received share certificates bearing a legend stating that such shares are
restricted pursuant to Rule 144 of the 1933 Securities Act. This restriction ensures that these shares would not be
immediately redistributed into the market and therefore not be part of a “public offering.” Based on an analysis of
the above factors, we have met the requirements to qualify for exemption under Section 4(2) of the Securities Act of
1933 for this transaction.
On December 31, 2007, we issued 5,700,000 shares of common stock to forty individuals in consideration of $0.01 per
share or a total of $57,000. The 5,700,000 shares so issued are being registered in this offering.
The foregoing 5,700,000 shares of common stock were issued as restricted securities pursuant to Reg. S of the Securities
Act of 1933 in that all of the sales took place outside the United States of America with non-US persons. The following
sets forth the identity of the class of persons to whom we sold these shares and the amount of shares for each shareholder:
(Here come the names of 40 individuals who bought shares.)
Form 8-K 12/21/2009
Effective December 9, 2009, Donald Axent resigned as president, chief executive officer and as a director of our company.
Effective December 9, 2009, William Kosoris resigned as secretary and as a director of our company.
Effective December 9, 2009, Brian Matson resigned as chief financial officer, treasurer and as a director of our company.
Effective December 9, 2009, Steve Talley, Nikolae Yagodka and Andrei B. Yasinskij were appointed directors of the company.
In addition, Steve Talley was appointed president and Nikolae was appointed secretary and treasurer.
Our board of directors now consists of Steve Talley, Nikolae Yagodka and Andrei B. Yasinskij.
Form 8-K 3/5/2010
Supatcha moves its office to Denver
Form 10-K 7/14/2010
In December 2007, we issued a total of 32,500,000 shares of restricted common stock to Donald Axent and William Kosoris,
our directors in consideration of $6,500.
Massey Asset Management Ltd. Common 12,500,000
Anthera West Capital Inc. Common 15,000,000
Steve Talley Common 5,000,000
(This is exactly the amount of shares issued to Axent and Kosoris.)
Common stock issued for cash ($0.01 per share) 28,500,000 (40 individuals)
On May 17, 2010, the Board of Directors approved a 5 for 1 forward stock split for all shareholders of the Company as of
June 30, 2010. All share and per share amounts have been retroactively restated to reflect this stock split.
b) On April 7, 2010, the Company announced the execution of an agreement with Melco Investments, Ltd. (“MIL”), providing
for a $10,000,000 financing. This financing is in the form of a convertible debenture with terms stipulating an interest
rate of 8% and a loan repayment term of 24 months from the date of execution of the agreement, by way of cash or through
the conversion of shares of the Company’s stock. The repayment terms of the financing are amenable to the Company’s
property development schedule and to future financings plans to retire the debt.
(I would bet these are floorless or toxic convertibles because they would not tell the terms of the financing in that filing).
The securities potentially offered to the investor, under the terms of the financing, will not be registered under the
Securities Act of 1933 as amended (the "Act"), and may not be offered or sold in the United States absent of registration,
or an applicable exemption from registration, under the Act
As of May 31, 2010, no proceeds have been received.
What do we learn from this? The originally offered shares under REG-S are free trading in the US since 2008,
the two car "promoters" Axent and Kosoris transferred their shares (without selling a single share) to Massey, Anthera
and Talley. In regards to the 40 original shareholders, i can´t proof it, but the normal way these shells are set up is
that you get enough share holders to comply with listing requirements and then you buy the shares back privately before
the company is listed.
So, how high is the float? And don´t forget the CD's!
Yeah i know, but BRE-X Drill Cores is the "Special Stuff".
What do you think they want to provide? Drill Cores? LOL
There might be some BRE-X Cores on ebay for sale.
They cleaned up the source code within 12 hours after my post. Also on the "Why Gold" Page they
replaced Steve Tally with Nikolae Yagodka but with the same statement.
That statement was originally from Wayne Gruden, CEO of American Sierra Gold Corp.(AMNP.OB).
Their site is under construction, but there is an old sticky on ihub : under "Why Gold?"
investorshub.advfn.com/boards//board.aspx?board_id=16159&NextStart=1155
anyone got a name for it???
How do you like "If you no slap ask, we slap you!"
Try to find Barlevskoye and Vynohradiv, if you don´t find em, try Beregovo and Kvasovo. These Properties
are at the same location as reported by Supatcha, but they belong to Catalyst Copper.
Hey Supatcha scam artists, you still have the bio of Mr. Foreman from Yale Resources on your Team page.
(It´s in the sourcecode!)
<!--<p>Mr. Foreman graduated with honors from Queen's University in 1992 and has worked in a wide spectrum of
geological environments involving both base and precious metals. He has worked for various junior mining
and exploration companies in North and South America. Throughout the mid 1990's Mr. Foreman worked on a series
of large multi-million dollar exploration programs in British Columbia, Yukon and Mexico.
From 1998 through 2002 Mr. Foreman worked on various projects exclusively in Peru. As Chief Geologist,
he was a key figure in putting the 1,000 tonne-per-day Santa Rosa open pit gold-silver mine into production.</p>-->
www.yaleresources.com/s/Management.asp
You should better clean that up before Yale sues you. LOL
I really don´t understand why you are still discussuing buyout offers, PR´s, misspellings and so on.
Barlevskoye and Vynohradiv do not exist. Based on Latitude and Longitudes in Supatchas so called
NI43-101 the Properties are called Beregovo and Kvasovo and are 100% owned by Catalyst Copper
(formerly SVIT/Whistler Gold Corp.). They filed a real NI43-101 on SEDAR Jul 21 2008. The Satellite
Pictures in the I-Box were from Beregovo and Kvasovo. You can do a Google Search on Beregovo and Kvasovo,
there are a lot of Documents including historical mining Data. This is real, only hardcore believers
can deny that. If you do a Google search on Barlevskoye Vynohradiv you will only find docs related
to Supatcha. If you realize that the properties do not exist, then there is no need to talk about
buyout offers any more.
Try SAEIE :
www.otcbb.com/asp/dailylist_search.asp?DirectSymbol=SAEIE&OTCBB=OTCBB
Record Date Symbol Company Name Dividend Type
6/30/2010 SAEIE Supatcha Resources, Inc. Common Stock Stock Dividend or Split
Donald Axent, the former President of SAEI was also President of TAO Minerals in 2006.
www.allbusiness.com/company-activities-management/company-structures-ownership/5378608-1.html
Quite a lot of jobs for a canadian car dealer.
Not long, it´s just a copy and paste and changing some names.
Hi Janice,
if you take a look at the source code of Supatchas Home Page you find two differnet CSS Styles :
Estilo1 and Estilo2, Estilo is the spanish word for Style. Programmers often user their mother
language for placeholders. Panama is spanish speaking.
Also very interesting is a remarked note on : Team Page
Just under the Line : Mr. Dennis Lipton brings.....
<!--<p>Mr. Foreman graduated with honors from Queen's University in 1992 and has worked in a wide spectrum
of geological environments involving both base and precious metals. He has worked for various junior mining
and exploration companies in North and South America. Throughout the mid 1990's Mr. Foreman worked on a series
of large multi-million dollar exploration programs in British Columbia, Yukon and Mexico. From 1998 through
2002 Mr. Foreman worked on various projects exclusively in Peru. As Chief Geologist, he was a key figure in
putting the 1,000 tonne-per-day Santa Rosa open pit gold-silver mine into production.</p>-->
HTH
I always look at the source code of questionable company webpages, because they mostly do it themselves without knowledge of the basics.
Kind Regards
miura