Tuesday, January 12, 2010 9:44:26 AM
Updated OPLO DD
OrderPro Logistics is now Securus Renewable Energy Inc CIK#1116884
as posted here by Aduke on 12/23/09
http://investorshub.advfn.com/boards/read_msg.aspx?message_id=44872054
This information was confirmed by brikk
http://investorshub.advfn.com/boards/read_msg.aspx?message_id=44868753
and masko23
http://investorshub.advfn.com/boards/read_msg.aspx?message_id=45010298
Steve Kurlander is the new President of Securus
http://nvsos.gov/sosentitysearch/CorpDetails.aspx?lx8nvq=DSBUrSJ1O8%252bZNuTSDALAGA%253d%253d&nt7=0
Steve Kurlander was appointed the President of Explortex Energy on the same day that John J. Lennon stepped down as posted by DD22
http://investorshub.advfn.com/boards/read_msg.aspx?message_id=44992463
I verified this with Mr. Lennon this morning. He gave me Mr. Kurlanders phone # (561-523-3500) I called Mr. Kurlander and was told he could not give out any information on this.
http://investorshub.advfn.com/boards/read_msg.aspx?message_id=45000339
The phone # confirms that OPLO's Steve Kurlander is this Steve Kurlander
http://stevenkurlander.com
http://www.plaxo.com/directory/profile/55834923596/340e3309/Steven/Kurlander
http://www.linkedin.com/pub/dir/?first=steve&last=kurlander
It seems Mr. Kurlander is getting into the energy business
this is Mr. Kurlander with Presidential candidate John McCain
Posted by: Aduke Date: Sunday, December 27, 2009 4:04:28 PM
In reply to: brikk who wrote msg# 1611 Post # of 4228
For those who are still searching for a missing link between OPLO and Securus Renewable Energy, Inc., here it is:
Go to pinksheets.com: http://www.pinksheets.com/pink/quote/quote.jsp?symbol=oplo
Click on Company Info. You will find:
CIK
0001116884
Now, go to SEC.gov: http://www.sec.gov/edgar/searchedgar/companysearch.html
Enter that CIK Number in the second field. Click on Find Companies. What company name do you see there?
Go to NEVADA: http://nvsos.gov/sosentitysearch/CorpDetails.aspx?lx8nvq=DSBUrSJ1O8%252bZNuTSDALAGA%253d%253d&nt7=0
Look under Additional Information. What is the Central Index Key you see there?
I see a match.
Posted by: Doubledown22 Date: Wednesday, December 30, 2009 9:43:26 PM
In reply to: None Post # of 4228
I'm going in circles with this thing trying to do some DD on it.
Things I know:
OrderPro Logistics does not have an active corporation filed in AZ or Nevada under that name.
OrderPro Logistics has been dissolved in AZ as a Corporation as of October 23rd, 2009.
http://starpas.azcc.gov/scripts/cgiip.exe/WService=wsbroker1/names-detail.p?name-id=09500320&type=CORPORATION
It appears based in the same CIK that OrderPro Logistics has converted in name over to Securus Renewable Energy in NV. Steve Kurlander filed amendments on Securus on December 7th and December 10th, 2009. This is based on the facts that Jeffrey M Smuda was listed as the historical CEO, President, and Treasurer of Renewable. I don't know the the exact technical details of how he (Kurlander) can do that (change the name from OrderPro Logistics to Securus Renewable Energy) through NV but it appears he did.
Interesting things I found:
Steven Kurlander didn't run Explortex Energy "into the ground" as some on here would like us to believe. For one he just became the CEO effective June 29th, 2009.
http://ih.advfn.com/p.php?pid=nmona&cb=1262208373&article=38507975&symbol=NO%5EEXPX
On June 29, 2009, Steven Kurlander was appointed as President of the Corporation. Mr. Kurlander is also Director, Treasurer and Secretary.
Steven Kurlander 51, Mr Kurlander has previously served as Victory Field Director for the Republican Party of Florida where his duties included building and managing an extensive grassroots organization for McCain/Palin Campaign. Prior to that Mr. Kurlander served as Vice President/Chief Operating Officer of Expedientclosings, Inc. where his duties included building and managing a real estate and marketing company providing notary closing services, title processing, and business development support to law offices, mortgage companies, and title companies in the State of Florida, designation as exclusive closing agent by a number of title and mortgage companies in South Florida market and for a number of Condo Conversion development programs.
Previously Mr. Kurlander served as in house counsel for Peachtree Settlement Services supervising the structuring of lottery winnings. Prior to that he served as General Counsel for Stern and Morrow Software Consulting/Sentry Works, Inc., County Legislator for the 9 th legislative district in Sullivan County, New York, Staff Attorney/Audit Business Specialist at Frontier Insurance Group, Editor and Publisher at The Independent Weekly Review and opened his own real estate practice in Monticello, New York."
So Mr. Kurlander now is the solely listed executive officer for Explortex Energy Inc. and Securus Renewable Energy companies.
Then why is the Executive Offices for Explortex Energy still listed in Centerville Massachusetts as they have always been?
http://investing.businessweek.com/research/stocks/private/snapshot.asp?privcapId=27956470
http://www.sec.gov/Archives/edgar/data/1364255/000121390009003649/extf10q1009_explortex.htm
Which leads me to my next point of discovery--John J. Lennon
This man was formerly the CEO of Explortex Energy and is involved in several companies presently...take a look.
http://nvsos.gov/sosentitysearch/corpsearch.aspx
Is this guy a stock seller or a merger/acquistions specialist that comes in and runs a company to get it on track or capitalized or financed etc...similar to what he recently done with this company
http://www.faqs.org/sec-filings/091112/NORTHWEST-CHARIOTS-INC_8-K/
Notice his resume and particularly that he is appointed these positions and brought in by the boards of directors of those companies. Also notice where these companies are trading now--at least the ones that are actively trading.
IMO there is some direct connection with this guy and a couple of different companies at play with a merger.
OrderPro Logistics
Securus Renewable Energy
Explortex Energy
On another interesting note OrderPro Logistics has a new CUSIP registered as OrderPro New
ORDERPRO LOGISTICS INC US68574P2065 (ISIN) COM NEW 68574P206 (Cusip)
https://www.isin.cusip.com/GetIssueDetailResult.do?cusip=68574P206
You can register for the CUSIP look-up service if you want to check it on your own.
https://www.isin.cusip.com/GetIssueDetailResult.do?cusip=465306207
Now everyone can make up their own minds and do their own DD and own theories from what I have put here. I don't know for sure but it sure looks like something is at play and not some pump and dump as many have alluded.
later,
DD22
OrderPro Logistics is now Securus Renewable Energy Inc CIK#1116884
as posted here by Aduke on 12/23/09
http://investorshub.advfn.com/boards/read_msg.aspx?message_id=44872054
This information was confirmed by brikk
http://investorshub.advfn.com/boards/read_msg.aspx?message_id=44868753
and masko23
http://investorshub.advfn.com/boards/read_msg.aspx?message_id=45010298
Steve Kurlander is the new President of Securus
http://nvsos.gov/sosentitysearch/CorpDetails.aspx?lx8nvq=DSBUrSJ1O8%252bZNuTSDALAGA%253d%253d&nt7=0
Steve Kurlander was appointed the President of Explortex Energy on the same day that John J. Lennon stepped down as posted by DD22
http://investorshub.advfn.com/boards/read_msg.aspx?message_id=44992463
I verified this with Mr. Lennon this morning. He gave me Mr. Kurlanders phone # (561-523-3500) I called Mr. Kurlander and was told he could not give out any information on this.
http://investorshub.advfn.com/boards/read_msg.aspx?message_id=45000339
The phone # confirms that OPLO's Steve Kurlander is this Steve Kurlander
http://stevenkurlander.com
http://www.plaxo.com/directory/profile/55834923596/340e3309/Steven/Kurlander
http://www.linkedin.com/pub/dir/?first=steve&last=kurlander
It seems Mr. Kurlander is getting into the energy business
this is Mr. Kurlander with Presidential candidate John McCain
Posted by: Aduke Date: Sunday, December 27, 2009 4:04:28 PM
In reply to: brikk who wrote msg# 1611 Post # of 4228
For those who are still searching for a missing link between OPLO and Securus Renewable Energy, Inc., here it is:
Go to pinksheets.com: http://www.pinksheets.com/pink/quote/quote.jsp?symbol=oplo
Click on Company Info. You will find:
CIK
0001116884
Now, go to SEC.gov: http://www.sec.gov/edgar/searchedgar/companysearch.html
Enter that CIK Number in the second field. Click on Find Companies. What company name do you see there?
Go to NEVADA: http://nvsos.gov/sosentitysearch/CorpDetails.aspx?lx8nvq=DSBUrSJ1O8%252bZNuTSDALAGA%253d%253d&nt7=0
Look under Additional Information. What is the Central Index Key you see there?
I see a match.
Posted by: Doubledown22 Date: Wednesday, December 30, 2009 9:43:26 PM
In reply to: None Post # of 4228
I'm going in circles with this thing trying to do some DD on it.
Things I know:
OrderPro Logistics does not have an active corporation filed in AZ or Nevada under that name.
OrderPro Logistics has been dissolved in AZ as a Corporation as of October 23rd, 2009.
http://starpas.azcc.gov/scripts/cgiip.exe/WService=wsbroker1/names-detail.p?name-id=09500320&type=CORPORATION
It appears based in the same CIK that OrderPro Logistics has converted in name over to Securus Renewable Energy in NV. Steve Kurlander filed amendments on Securus on December 7th and December 10th, 2009. This is based on the facts that Jeffrey M Smuda was listed as the historical CEO, President, and Treasurer of Renewable. I don't know the the exact technical details of how he (Kurlander) can do that (change the name from OrderPro Logistics to Securus Renewable Energy) through NV but it appears he did.
Interesting things I found:
Steven Kurlander didn't run Explortex Energy "into the ground" as some on here would like us to believe. For one he just became the CEO effective June 29th, 2009.
http://ih.advfn.com/p.php?pid=nmona&cb=1262208373&article=38507975&symbol=NO%5EEXPX
On June 29, 2009, Steven Kurlander was appointed as President of the Corporation. Mr. Kurlander is also Director, Treasurer and Secretary.
Steven Kurlander 51, Mr Kurlander has previously served as Victory Field Director for the Republican Party of Florida where his duties included building and managing an extensive grassroots organization for McCain/Palin Campaign. Prior to that Mr. Kurlander served as Vice President/Chief Operating Officer of Expedientclosings, Inc. where his duties included building and managing a real estate and marketing company providing notary closing services, title processing, and business development support to law offices, mortgage companies, and title companies in the State of Florida, designation as exclusive closing agent by a number of title and mortgage companies in South Florida market and for a number of Condo Conversion development programs.
Previously Mr. Kurlander served as in house counsel for Peachtree Settlement Services supervising the structuring of lottery winnings. Prior to that he served as General Counsel for Stern and Morrow Software Consulting/Sentry Works, Inc., County Legislator for the 9 th legislative district in Sullivan County, New York, Staff Attorney/Audit Business Specialist at Frontier Insurance Group, Editor and Publisher at The Independent Weekly Review and opened his own real estate practice in Monticello, New York."
So Mr. Kurlander now is the solely listed executive officer for Explortex Energy Inc. and Securus Renewable Energy companies.
Then why is the Executive Offices for Explortex Energy still listed in Centerville Massachusetts as they have always been?
http://investing.businessweek.com/research/stocks/private/snapshot.asp?privcapId=27956470
http://www.sec.gov/Archives/edgar/data/1364255/000121390009003649/extf10q1009_explortex.htm
Which leads me to my next point of discovery--John J. Lennon
This man was formerly the CEO of Explortex Energy and is involved in several companies presently...take a look.
http://nvsos.gov/sosentitysearch/corpsearch.aspx
Is this guy a stock seller or a merger/acquistions specialist that comes in and runs a company to get it on track or capitalized or financed etc...similar to what he recently done with this company
http://www.faqs.org/sec-filings/091112/NORTHWEST-CHARIOTS-INC_8-K/
Notice his resume and particularly that he is appointed these positions and brought in by the boards of directors of those companies. Also notice where these companies are trading now--at least the ones that are actively trading.
IMO there is some direct connection with this guy and a couple of different companies at play with a merger.
OrderPro Logistics
Securus Renewable Energy
Explortex Energy
On another interesting note OrderPro Logistics has a new CUSIP registered as OrderPro New
ORDERPRO LOGISTICS INC US68574P2065 (ISIN) COM NEW 68574P206 (Cusip)
https://www.isin.cusip.com/GetIssueDetailResult.do?cusip=68574P206
You can register for the CUSIP look-up service if you want to check it on your own.
https://www.isin.cusip.com/GetIssueDetailResult.do?cusip=465306207
Now everyone can make up their own minds and do their own DD and own theories from what I have put here. I don't know for sure but it sure looks like something is at play and not some pump and dump as many have alluded.
later,
DD22
"Do not dwell in the past, do not dream of the future, concentrate the mind on the present moment."
Join the InvestorsHub Community
Register for free to join our community of investors and share your ideas. You will also get access to streaming quotes, interactive charts, trades, portfolio, live options flow and more tools.