Regarding Jason Black's role and connection to the Mark Miller coverup here. This OTC Filing was done in November of 2019 for the period ending October 23, 2019, while Jason Black was the CEO.
Looks to me like Jason Black checked the box that there were no outstanding debt notes.
Why didn't Jason Black disclose the note? He was very well aware of the Note. He signed an agreement on July 17, 2019 to split the proceeds from the note, with Jason Black getting 12.5% through his "Market Cap" entity.
Where are the conversions that were done in October 2019, prior to the period end date of October 31, 2019?
According to the filing done this week, correcting past filings, 136,130,000 shares were issued to Capitol Capital Corp on October 17, 2019 for a note conversion and 136,130,000 share were issued to Capitol Capital Corp on October 31, 2019 for a note conversion.
But Jason Black didn't list those conversions in the OTC filing he did on November 7, 2019 for the period ending October 31, 2019.
This is Jason Black's signature attesting to the accuracy of the filing isn't it?
Capitol Capital Corp was registered in New York, but Capitol Capital Corp was domiciled in Wyoming. The New York entity even says this:
And this Wyoming SOS filing shows that Mark Miller became the sole control person of Capitol Capital Corp on October 6, 2019 and changed the address to P.O. Box 194, Pequot Lakes, Minnesota, right before the debt conversions started
And I think that Jason Black would know, as the CEO of IGEX from October 2019 through December 2019, exactly who was signing the paperwork for Capitol Capital Corp being presented to the Transfer Agent to facilitate the debt conversions.
And I think Jason Black knew exactly where the money was going from the stock sales.
A bank account under the name Capitol Capital Corp controlled by Mark Miller.
That same bank account paid Jason Black (Market Cap Concepts LLC) $62,412,50 on December 16, 2019.
Jason Black can play dumb all he wants and can try to pretend that he knew nothing about the note and the note conversions and who controlled Capitol Capital Corp despite his name being all over the place as Capitol Capital Corp blazed a trial through several public issuers under Jason Black's management, including IGEX, MEDH, SAPX, and CNNA, but the facts speak otherwise.