Sunday, August 15, 2021 1:16:10 AM
$AVVH 👀$45M MC today!!👀
— TradersQue (@QueTraders) August 3, 2021
🐸🐸Way below what's coming!!🐸🐸
🔥thinner by the day. GLTA🔥
👉#TrapHouseTrades 🐒🚀🌛https://t.co/exQz7046cShttps://t.co/Ujewc9rhlJ pic.twitter.com/0V8XwIFSVm
$avvh 25% SHARE REDUCTION pic.twitter.com/e41zWDCHKS
— PaTaterDrip (@PaTaterDrip) July 29, 2021
$AVVH, Omnis Public Capital Management plans to merge AVVH with the newly created company, Gold Quest Capital, Inc. https://t.co/QJzmNCTUHf
— TradersQue (@QueTraders) July 23, 2021
944,000,000 shares will be canceled by the TA.https://t.co/bTifHJhbDb pic.twitter.com/oKEzc9HAEN
$AVVH with the newly created company🔥Gold Quest Capital, Inc. @GoldQuestCap
— TradersQue (@QueTraders) July 26, 2021
👀AVVH/Gold Quest Capital will share some of the same management team, knowledge & strategies, as well as office space & resources with, @Goldquestgroup
👉Gold Quest Group LLC.👈https://t.co/fk1V8TGrTd pic.twitter.com/8NMmSwQKvJ
$AVVH 🐸🐸🐸Update Soon!🐸🐸🐸
— TradersQue (@QueTraders) July 27, 2021
1001 West Loop S Ste 803, Houston, TX 77027
Gold Quest Group, @Goldquestgroup
Gold Quest Capital, @GoldQuestCap https://t.co/t212Y3dgSx
Miguel Sanchez, CEOhttps://t.co/E6KfUj0DXB
1-786-473-1255
ir@goldquestcapital.com
info@avvaaworldhealth.com pic.twitter.com/zbEDOQ6qqB
$AVVH share lowering pic.twitter.com/tiSrXzol27
— JesseOTC 🐝 (@JesseOTC) July 29, 2021
03/12/2021 Supplemental Information - Court Appointed Custodian
On December 8, 2020, Kareem Mansour, President of SSM Monopoly Corporation, a New York corporation and shareholder of the Company, filed an Application for Appointment of Custodian with the Laramie District Court, of the District Court of Clark County in the State of Nevada, requesting that Mr. Mansour be appointed as custodian of the Company. On January 25, 2021, pursuant to NRS 78.347, the Court appointed Kareem Mansour as custodian of the Company. The Court’s order allows Mr. Mansour to exercise all of the powers of the Company, through or in place of its board of directors, to the extent necessary to manage and continue the business and affairs.
https://backend.otcmarkets.com/otcapi/company/financial-report/273894/content
03/25/2021 Annual Report - Annual Report 2020
Name: Carey Cooley
Title: President, CEO
Relationship to Issuer: Sole Officer, Director
Total shares authorized: 4,000,000,000 as of date: 05/31/2020
Total shares outstanding: 1,910,828,559 as of date: 05/31/2020
Number of shares in the Public Float2: 1,578,831,252 as of date: 05/31/2020
Total number of shareholders of record: 130 as of date: 05/31/2020
https://backend.otcmarkets.com/otcapi/company/financial-report/275217/content
AVVH
Market Cap 36,834,634 08/13/2021
Authorized Shares 4,000,000,000 08/13/2021
Outstanding Shares 1,515,828,559 08/13/2021
Restricted 331,984,695 08/13/2021
Unrestricted 1,183,843,864 08/13/2021
Held at DTC 812,910,505 08/13/2021
https://www.otcmarkets.com/stock/AVVH/security
03/29/2021 Attorney Letter with Respect to Current Information - All periods from 5/31/2019 through 02/28/2021
We have (i) personally interviewed via phone conference the management and all directorsof the Company, more specifically Carey Cooley, CEO, President, Treasurer, all owners of 5% or greater of the outstanding stock including Carey Cooley and Kareem Mansour, however, John Stewart Farley is believed to be deceased; Lorie Campbell Farley and Jason Price were associated with prior management and current management (this is a custodial shell)
To the best of our knowledge, after inquiry of management, including the Chief Executive Officer and the Board of Directors, neither the Issuer, the 5% holders of securities of the Company, nor the corporate counsel are currently under investigation by any federal or state regulatory authority for any violation of federal or state securities laws.
Stephen Mills, Esq
https://backend.otcmarkets.com/otcapi/company/financial-report/275936/content
5/28/21 8-K Filing
COMPANY OFFICERS & CONTACTS
Miguel Sanchez President, CEO
Carey W Cooley Secretary
Jean Paul Garzon Treasurer
On April 30, 2021, by Unanimous Written Consent of the Board of Directors in accordance with the Company’s bylaws, the Board of Directors elected the following officers:
Miguel Sanchez President & CEO
Jean Paul Garzon Treasurer
Carey W. Cooley Secretary
Patrice Ashiofu Vice President
Luis Beita Vice President
Ankit Amin Vice President
AVVAA WORLD HEALTH CARE PRODUCTS, INC.
DATED: May 28, 2021
By:Carey W Cooley - Secretary/Director
https://www.otcmarkets.com/filing/html?id=14998528&guid=xN01kHoyW6sX6Mh
VHAI - Vocodia Partners with Leading Political Super PACs to Revolutionize Fundraising Efforts • VHAI • Sep 19, 2024 11:48 AM
Dear Cashmere Group Holding Co. AKA Swifty Global Signs Binding Letter of Intent to be Acquired by Signing Day Sports • DRCR • Sep 19, 2024 10:26 AM
HealthLynked Launches Virtual Urgent Care Through Partnership with Lyric Health. • HLYK • Sep 19, 2024 8:00 AM
Element79 Gold Corp. Appoints Kevin Arias as Advisor to the Board of Directors, Strengthening Strategic Leadership • ELMGF • Sep 18, 2024 10:29 AM
Mawson Finland Limited Further Expands the Known Mineralized Zones at Rajapalot: Palokas step-out drills 7 metres @ 9.1 g/t gold & 706 ppm cobalt • MFL • Sep 17, 2024 9:02 AM
PickleJar Announces Integration With OptCulture to Deliver Holistic Fan Experiences at Venue Point of Sale • PKLE • Sep 17, 2024 8:00 AM