Monday, February 04, 2019 10:27:21 PM
https://www.bloomberg.com/research/stocks/private/person.asp?personId=107904500&privcapId=242431896
REVERSE MERGER NOW CONFIRMED WITH $LCTZ AND DEVMAR EQUITIES, INC.
https://www.nvsos.gov/sosentitysearch/CorpDetails.aspx?lx8nvq=bDC8QtfiNQYtALE2SM7tIQ%253d%253d
https://devmardevelopment.com/
RICHARD CHIANG BACKGROUND - REVERSE MERGER GENIUS
BOOOOOOMMMMMMMMMM
Richard Chiang has extensive experience in the financial services industry at Lehman Brothers, Wedbush Securities (Wedbush Morgan Securities), Roth Capital Partners LLC., and Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc where he personally managed over $600 million in client assets.
He has extensive hands on experience in lead roles on several reverse mergers transactions with both US and international cross borders transactions at leading reverse mergers advisory firms.
Mr. Chiang is a graduate of the University of California, Berkeley, The Haas School of Business and the Goldman School of Public Policy at UC Berkeley.
He has held several securities licenses such as the FINRA Series 7, Series 24, Series 63, and the NASAA Uniform Investment Advisors Law Series 65 license.
Chief Executive Officer, President, Treasurer, Secretary and Director of Andes 9 Inc. from July 27, 2015 to September 12, 2016 and served as its Chairman and Chief Financial Officer until September 12, 2016. Mr. Chiang served as the
Chief Executive Officer, President, Treasurer and Secretary of Andes 7 Inc. from July 27, 2015 to February 12, 2016 and served as its Chief Financial Officer.
Treasurer of APEX 3, Inc., since February 14, 2012 and SLM Technologies, Inc. since June 18, 2013.
Managing Director of the Redwood Asia Fund at Redwood Capital, Investment Arm and Redwood Asia Fund, L.P.
Chief Executive Officer, Secretary and Treasurer of Andes 2 Inc. from June 23, 2014 to July 1, 2015 and also served as its President and Chairman of the Board until July 1, 2015.
Treasurer and Secretary of Apex 10 Inc. since May 20, 2013. He served as Chief Executive Officer, Secretary and Treasurer of Apex 11 Inc. since May 20, 2013 until June 2015 and served as its Chairman, President and Chief Financial Officer.
Chief Executive, Secretary and Treasurer of Andes 3 Inc. from June 23, 2014 to February 27, 2015 and served as its President & Chief Financial Officer until February 27, 2015.
He has over 15 years experience in areas of investment banking, fund management, corporate finance, sales and trading, venture services and private wealth management.
Chief Executive Officer, Secretary and Treasurer of Evans Brewing Company Inc. (alternate name, Alpine 3 Inc.) since June 18, 2013 and served as its Chairman, Chief Financial Officer and President.
Chief Executive Officer and Secretary of SLM Technologies, Inc. since June 18, 2013 and served as its President and Chief Financial Officer.
Chief Executive Officer and Chief Financial Officer of Apex 10 Inc. since May 20, 2013 and served as its President.
Chief Executive Officer, Treasurer and Secretary of Apex 2, Inc. from May 17, 2011 to October 28, 2011 and served as its Chairman, President and Chief Financial Officer until October 28, 2011. He served as the
Chief Executive Officer, Treasurer and Secretary of BioAdaptives, Inc. from December 12, 2012 to June 21, 2013 and served as its Chairman, President and Chief Financial Officer until June 21, 2013.
Chief Executive Officer, Treasurer and Secretary of Formosa Liberty Corporation since May 18, 2012 and served as its President.
Chief Executive Officer, President, Managing Director, Treasurer, Secretary and Chairman of APEX 1 Inc. from June 21, 2010 to May 6, 2011 and served as its Chief Financial Officer until May 6, 2011.
Chief Executive Officer, Treasurer and Secretary of Vapetek, Inc. (alternate name, Alpine 2 Inc.) from June 18, 2013 to March 6, 2014 and served as its President & Chief Financial Officer until March 6, 2014.
Chief Executive Officer, Secretary and Treasurer of Alpine 4 Inc. from April 22, 2014 to June 23, 2014 and served as its Chief Financial Officer and President until June 23, 2014.
Chief Executive Officer, President, Chief Financial Officer, Treasurer, Secretary and Director at Apex 9 Inc from May 20, 2013 to July 17, 2013.
Chief Executive Officer, Secretary and Treasurer of AmericaTowne, Inc. from April 22, 2014 to June 26, 2014 and served as its Chief Financial Officer and President until June 26, 2014.
Chief Executive Officer, Secretary and Treasurer of Napa Sonoma Group Inc. from June 23, 2014 to September 26, 2014 and served as its Chief Financial Officer and President until September 26, 2014.
Chief Financial Officer, Treasurer and Secretary of US Nuclear Corp since February 14, 2012.
Chief Executive Officer, Treasurer and Secretary of Alpine 6 Inc., from April 22, 2014 to July 9, 2014 and served as its President and Chief Financial Officer until July 9, 2014.
Chief Executive Officer, Treasurer and Secretary of Apex 7, Inc. from December 12, 2012 to April 25, 2013 and served as its President and Chief Financial Officer.
Chairman of the Board, Chief Executive Officer, President, Chief Financial Officer, Treasurer and Secretary of APEX 8 Inc. until June 20, 2013.
Chief Executive Officer, Treasurer, Secretary of Apex 4 Inc., from May 18, 2012 to December 10, 2012 and served as its President until December 10, 2012.
He joined Redwood Capital on June 8, 2010.
Associate Director of Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc.
Chairman, President and Chief Financial Officer of Apex 6 Inc. until May 13, 2013 and served as its Chief Executive Officer, Treasurer and Secretary from July 19, 2012 to May 13, 2013.
Senior Vice President of Roth Capital Partners, LLC.
Vice President of Wedbush Securities Inc. and Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc.
Chief Executive, President, Chief Financial Officer, Secretary and Treasurer at Environmental Science and Technologies, Inc., from June 18, 2012 to December 10, 2012
Chief Financial Officer and Secretary of APEX 3, Inc.
Associate of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.
Associate Partner of Bay Peak LLC from January 2009 to January 2010
Chairman of SLM Technologies, Inc.
Chairman of Alpine 1 Inc.
Chairman of Andes 7 Inc. until February 12, 2016
Chairman of Apex 7, Inc. until April 25, 2013
Vapetek, Inc. until March 6, 2014 and Apex 10 Inc
Director of Apex 4 Inc., since May 18, 2012
Director of APEX 3, Inc since February 14, 2012
Director of Napa Sonoma Group Inc. since October 17, 2014
SLM Technologies, Inc. since June 18, 2013
Apex 11 Inc. since May 20, 2013
Andes 3 Inc. since June 23, 2014
Director of Andes 2 Inc. from June 23, 2014 to February 12, 2016
Director of Apex 10 Inc. since May 20, 2013
Director of Environmental Science and Technologies, Inc., from June 18, 2012 to December 10, 2012
Evans Brewing Company Inc. from May 23, 2014 to February 19, 2015
AmericaTowne, Inc. from April 22, 2014 to June 26, 2014
Alpine 4 Inc. from April 22, 2014 to June 23, 2014
Apex 2, Inc. from May 17, 2011 to October 28, 2011
Vapetek, Inc. from June 18, 2013 to March 6, 2014
Napa Sonoma Group Inc. from June 23, 2014 to September 26, 2014
Alpine 6 Inc. from April 22, 2014 to July 9, 2014
BioAdaptives, Inc. from December 12, 2012 to June 21, 2013
Apex 6 Inc. from July 19, 2012 May 13, 2013
Formosa Liberty Corporation since May 18, 2012
US Nuclear Corp from February 14, 2012 to March 31, 2013
Director of Technical Associates, Inc, Si
Other Affiliations
Wedbush Securities Inc.
Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.
Roth Capital Partners, LLC
Bear, Stearns & Co. Inc.
Bayhawk Ales, Inc.
University of California Berkeley
Haas School of Business
US Nuclear Corp.
Goldman School of Public Policy at the University of California at Berkeley
Bay Peak LLC
Redwood Capital, Investment Arm
Redwood Asia Fund, L.P.
Dongxing International, Inc.
Apex 2, Inc.
US Nuclear Corp.
NanoSave Technologies Inc.
Ecard Inc.
Apex 6 Inc.
Apex 7, Inc.
BioAdaptives, Inc.
DCA Asset Management, Inc.
Apex 10 Inc.
Apex 11 Inc.
Evans Brewing Company Inc.
Nodechain, Inc.
Alpine 6 Inc.
AmericaTowne, Inc.
Napa Sonoma Group Inc.
EliteSoft Global Inc.
Andes 2 Inc.
Alpine 4 Technologies Ltd.
CAT9 Group Inc.
Vortronnix Technologies, Inc.
Andes 6 Inc.
Andes 9 Inc.
ANDES 7 Inc.
Andes 8 Inc.
VHAI - Vocodia Partners with Leading Political Super PACs to Revolutionize Fundraising Efforts • VHAI • Sep 19, 2024 11:48 AM
Dear Cashmere Group Holding Co. AKA Swifty Global Signs Binding Letter of Intent to be Acquired by Signing Day Sports • DRCR • Sep 19, 2024 10:26 AM
HealthLynked Launches Virtual Urgent Care Through Partnership with Lyric Health. • HLYK • Sep 19, 2024 8:00 AM
Element79 Gold Corp. Appoints Kevin Arias as Advisor to the Board of Directors, Strengthening Strategic Leadership • ELMGF • Sep 18, 2024 10:29 AM
Mawson Finland Limited Further Expands the Known Mineralized Zones at Rajapalot: Palokas step-out drills 7 metres @ 9.1 g/t gold & 706 ppm cobalt • MFL • Sep 17, 2024 9:02 AM
PickleJar Announces Integration With OptCulture to Deliver Holistic Fan Experiences at Venue Point of Sale • PKLE • Sep 17, 2024 8:00 AM