Followers | 721 |
Posts | 61829 |
Boards Moderated | 0 |
Alias Born | 05/15/2006 |
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 3:02:19 PM
Yates resigned. Good luck with that. Who did he resign to? He owns the company and is the only one in it.
A new CEO? Been through that before many times. He owns the company and can fire the CEOs.
The board of directors did this or that. Good luck with that. Yates is the only one on the board.
Mark Lucky. Give me a break and do some DD and find out what the guy is about. He was here before, and he is very good at what he does. Check his bio. He did it with over 50 companies. He knows how to bring it up a tick or two for massive dumps then repeat the cycle when it drops. He did it here before. They dumped a few billion. He sucks people into a stock when it gets to no bid so the company can continue with massive dumps. And the dumps are massive. He is the best you can get at what he does. Find out his past and who is involved.
-------------------------------------
Twisted wording from filing. Explained above:
On February 12, 2018 Mr. Kevin Yates resigned his positions as a Director and as Chief Executive Officer of the Company. There were no disagreements between the Company and Mr. Yates on any matter.
On February 12, 2018 the Company’s Board of Directors appointed Messrs. Mark Lucky and Tom Grbelja to the Board of Directors. In addition, Mr. Lucky was appointed to be the Chairman and Chief Executive Officer for the Company. Biographical information for Messrs. Lucky and Grbelja are as follows:
Mark Lucky
Mr. Lucky has more than 20 years of experience serving as a public company chief financial officer. His professional experience includes working with start-ups, development-stage and mature companies in a wide variety of industries. Mr. Lucky has worked as a consultant to various public and private companies, including RealBiz Media Group, Inc. (OTCBB:RBIZ), Intelligent Living America, Inc. (OTCBB: ILIV), and Ronn Motor Group, Inc. Prior to that, Mr. Lucky served as the CFO for IceWeb Inc. (OTCBB: IWEB) from March, 2007 to May, 2014. From 2004 to 2005 he served as Vice President of Finance and Administration at Galt Associates, Inc., a Sterling, Virginia informatics/ technology and medical research services company and from 2001 to 2004 he was Vice President of Finance and Administration of MindShare Design, Inc., a San Francisco, California based internet technology company. During his career Mr. Lucky has also been employed by Axys Pharmaceuticals, Inc (NASDAQ: AXPH) a San Francisco, California-based early stage drug discovery biotech company, PriceWaterhouseCoopers, LLC, COMPASS Management and Leasing, Inc., Mindscape, Inc., The Walt Disney Company and KPMG. Mr. Lucky formerly served as a member of the board of directors of Intelligent Living America, Inc., VOIS Inc. and HASCO Medical, Inc. Mr. Lucky received a B.A. degree in Economics from the University of California, Los Angeles.
Recent VISM News
- Form 8-K - Current report • Edgar (US Regulatory) • 07/31/2024 11:15:23 AM
- Form 10-Q - Quarterly report [Sections 13 or 15(d)] • Edgar (US Regulatory) • 05/15/2024 08:30:48 PM
- Form 10-Q - Quarterly report [Sections 13 or 15(d)] • Edgar (US Regulatory) • 02/20/2024 09:16:24 PM
- Form NT 10-Q - Notification of inability to timely file Form 10-Q or 10-QSB • Edgar (US Regulatory) • 02/14/2024 09:20:06 PM
- Form 8-K - Current report • Edgar (US Regulatory) • 12/14/2023 09:22:13 PM
- Form 8-K - Current report • Edgar (US Regulatory) • 11/29/2023 01:28:58 PM
- Form 10-Q - Quarterly report [Sections 13 or 15(d)] • Edgar (US Regulatory) • 11/20/2023 09:30:56 PM
- Form 8-K - Current report • Edgar (US Regulatory) • 10/25/2023 09:10:42 PM
VHAI - Vocodia Partners with Leading Political Super PACs to Revolutionize Fundraising Efforts • VHAI • Sep 19, 2024 11:48 AM
Dear Cashmere Group Holding Co. AKA Swifty Global Signs Binding Letter of Intent to be Acquired by Signing Day Sports • DRCR • Sep 19, 2024 10:26 AM
HealthLynked Launches Virtual Urgent Care Through Partnership with Lyric Health. • HLYK • Sep 19, 2024 8:00 AM
Element79 Gold Corp. Appoints Kevin Arias as Advisor to the Board of Directors, Strengthening Strategic Leadership • ELMGF • Sep 18, 2024 10:29 AM
Mawson Finland Limited Further Expands the Known Mineralized Zones at Rajapalot: Palokas step-out drills 7 metres @ 9.1 g/t gold & 706 ppm cobalt • MFL • Sep 17, 2024 9:02 AM
PickleJar Announces Integration With OptCulture to Deliver Holistic Fan Experiences at Venue Point of Sale • PKLE • Sep 17, 2024 8:00 AM