Tuesday, December 26, 2017 2:18:01 PM
"On July 1, 2017, 2017, a Special Meeting of Shareholders was held and Juan Sebastian Gutierrez Lavin was appointed as the sole Director of the Company. Thereafter, on the same date, a Special Meeting of the Board of Directors was held and Mr. Lavin was appointed as the President, CEO and Treasurer of the Company. Mr. Lavin accepted all positions, whereupon Alicia Pradal Morales resigned her positions as an Officer and Director."
But on July 28th - Juan Sebastian Gutierrez Lavin signed off on the 8-K as the CEO.
But now you (Greg Manos) are stating you have control of the company.
IG
"The Hour Between Dog and Wolf"
VHAI - Vocodia Partners with Leading Political Super PACs to Revolutionize Fundraising Efforts • VHAI • Sep 19, 2024 11:48 AM
Dear Cashmere Group Holding Co. AKA Swifty Global Signs Binding Letter of Intent to be Acquired by Signing Day Sports • DRCR • Sep 19, 2024 10:26 AM
HealthLynked Launches Virtual Urgent Care Through Partnership with Lyric Health. • HLYK • Sep 19, 2024 8:00 AM
Element79 Gold Corp. Appoints Kevin Arias as Advisor to the Board of Directors, Strengthening Strategic Leadership • ELMGF • Sep 18, 2024 10:29 AM
Mawson Finland Limited Further Expands the Known Mineralized Zones at Rajapalot: Palokas step-out drills 7 metres @ 9.1 g/t gold & 706 ppm cobalt • MFL • Sep 17, 2024 9:02 AM
PickleJar Announces Integration With OptCulture to Deliver Holistic Fan Experiences at Venue Point of Sale • PKLE • Sep 17, 2024 8:00 AM