Followers | 776 |
Posts | 81742 |
Boards Moderated | 6 |
Alias Born | 12/25/2009 |
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 12:38:48 PM
DIRECTORS; APPOINTMENT OF PRINCIPAL CERTAIN OFFICERS.
Under the Agreement, the Company entered in a Mutual Release and Separation Agreement
with Mr. Segersten dated May 25, 2017 under which Mr. Segersten resigned as a director, and
president and chief executive officer, of the Company. In addition, the Company elected Dom L.
Gatto, the beneficial owner of the Purchaser and a former director of the Company (from 2006 to
2009), a director of the Company and the Company’s president and chief executive officer. In
addition, as of June 28, 2017, the Company entered into a long-term employment agreement with
Mr. Gatto for him to serve on a full-time basis as president and chief executive officer through
December 31, 2022, and to receive compensation of $13,500 per month through December 31,
2017, and thereafter an annual salary of $250,000.
Mr. Gatto, age 56, he is the founder of AMG Development, LLC, a medical deviceconsulting
firm, and has served as an executive consultant for this firm from 2005 to the present.
His professional experience ranges from product management to executive management for over
ten start-up entities. He founded MedTrek, an innovative surgical company that partnered with
Olympus worldwide. He was later chief operating officer for start-up Acueity Healthcare, a
revolutionary technology for early detection of breast cancer featured in Time magazine as one of
the top five medical technologies for breast cancer detection and treatment. Since Acueity, he has
been an executive advisor to startup entities, including Acclarent, Inc. (recently acquired by
Johnson & Johnson).
During his career, Mr. Gatto has developed, launched and successfully managed over 75
medical devices, ranging from polymer-based disposables to integrated imaging systems. He holds
seven patents and is co-inventor on three patent pending medical devices. Mr. Gatto graduated
Magna Cum Laude with a B.S. degree in Marketing from Quinnipiac University and attended the
Executive Management program at the John E. Anderson School of Business – UCLA. He is
currently an Entrepreneur in Residence at The University of Notre Dame’s Mendoza School of
Business for entrepreneurial studies.
3
SIGNATURE
The Company has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned,
thereunto duly authorized.
Solos Endoscopy, Inc.
Dated: Oct. 17, 2017 By: /s/ Dom L. Gatto
Dom L. Gatto, President
VHAI - Vocodia Partners with Leading Political Super PACs to Revolutionize Fundraising Efforts • VHAI • Sep 19, 2024 11:48 AM
Dear Cashmere Group Holding Co. AKA Swifty Global Signs Binding Letter of Intent to be Acquired by Signing Day Sports • DRCR • Sep 19, 2024 10:26 AM
HealthLynked Launches Virtual Urgent Care Through Partnership with Lyric Health. • HLYK • Sep 19, 2024 8:00 AM
Element79 Gold Corp. Appoints Kevin Arias as Advisor to the Board of Directors, Strengthening Strategic Leadership • ELMGF • Sep 18, 2024 10:29 AM
Mawson Finland Limited Further Expands the Known Mineralized Zones at Rajapalot: Palokas step-out drills 7 metres @ 9.1 g/t gold & 706 ppm cobalt • MFL • Sep 17, 2024 9:02 AM
PickleJar Announces Integration With OptCulture to Deliver Holistic Fan Experiences at Venue Point of Sale • PKLE • Sep 17, 2024 8:00 AM