Wednesday, August 02, 2017 5:21:54 PM
On July 10, 2017, Lisa Demmons resigned as Chief Executive Officer, Chief Financial Officer, and Director. Ms. Demmons’ resignation letter is attached hereto as Exhibit 17.1.
On July 10, 2017, a majority voting block of shareholders appointed and elected Matthew Miller as Chief Executive Officer, Chief Financial Officer and Director. Mr. Miller, 53, received his juris doctorate from the J. Reuben Clark Law school at BYU in 1993 and graduated with a B.S. and B.A. from Utah State University in 1988. He currently practices law in Provo, Utah, specializing in labor law, immigration law, estate planning and criminal defense. From 2001 to this year, he served as the president and CEO of Revolution Manufacturing, a company that developed and distributed snow sports sportswear products ranging from snowboards, binding, skis, parkas, gloves, and masks.
https://ih.advfn.com/p.php?pid=nmona&article=75369172&symbol=NO%5EGMEV
VHAI - Vocodia Partners with Leading Political Super PACs to Revolutionize Fundraising Efforts • VHAI • Sep 19, 2024 11:48 AM
Dear Cashmere Group Holding Co. AKA Swifty Global Signs Binding Letter of Intent to be Acquired by Signing Day Sports • DRCR • Sep 19, 2024 10:26 AM
HealthLynked Launches Virtual Urgent Care Through Partnership with Lyric Health. • HLYK • Sep 19, 2024 8:00 AM
Element79 Gold Corp. Appoints Kevin Arias as Advisor to the Board of Directors, Strengthening Strategic Leadership • ELMGF • Sep 18, 2024 10:29 AM
Mawson Finland Limited Further Expands the Known Mineralized Zones at Rajapalot: Palokas step-out drills 7 metres @ 9.1 g/t gold & 706 ppm cobalt • MFL • Sep 17, 2024 9:02 AM
PickleJar Announces Integration With OptCulture to Deliver Holistic Fan Experiences at Venue Point of Sale • PKLE • Sep 17, 2024 8:00 AM