Friday, November 29, 2013 11:45:44 AM
29-Nov-2013
Change in Directors or Principal Officers
Item 5.02 Departure of Directors or Certain Officers; Election of Directors; Appointment of Certain Officers; Compensatory Arrangements of Certain Officers.
On November 27, 2013, Mark Matthews resigned his position as President of Arista Power, Inc. effective November 29, 2013 to take the position of Vice President of Sales and Marketing at EaglePicher Technologies, LLC. Mr. Matthews will remain a member of the Board of Directors of Arista Power, Inc.
Effective November 29, 2013, William A. Schmitz, Chief Executive Officer of Arista Power, Inc., will also become President of Arista Power, Inc.
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, the registrant has duly caused this report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
ARISTA POWER, INC.
By: /s/ William A. Schmitz
Name: William A. Schmitz
Title: Chief Executive Officer
Dated: November 29, 2013
VHAI - Vocodia Partners with Leading Political Super PACs to Revolutionize Fundraising Efforts • VHAI • Sep 19, 2024 11:48 AM
Dear Cashmere Group Holding Co. AKA Swifty Global Signs Binding Letter of Intent to be Acquired by Signing Day Sports • DRCR • Sep 19, 2024 10:26 AM
HealthLynked Launches Virtual Urgent Care Through Partnership with Lyric Health. • HLYK • Sep 19, 2024 8:00 AM
Element79 Gold Corp. Appoints Kevin Arias as Advisor to the Board of Directors, Strengthening Strategic Leadership • ELMGF • Sep 18, 2024 10:29 AM
Mawson Finland Limited Further Expands the Known Mineralized Zones at Rajapalot: Palokas step-out drills 7 metres @ 9.1 g/t gold & 706 ppm cobalt • MFL • Sep 17, 2024 9:02 AM
PickleJar Announces Integration With OptCulture to Deliver Holistic Fan Experiences at Venue Point of Sale • PKLE • Sep 17, 2024 8:00 AM