Friday, November 17, 2017 2:30:35 PM
Effective immediately, Mark Miller resigned as President, CEO and Sole Board Member of Encompass Holdings, Inc.
Effective immediately, J. Scott Webber will be reappointed as President, CEO and Sole Board Member of Encompass Holdings, Inc.
SIGNATURES
Pursuant to the requirements of the Securities and Exchange Act of 1934, the Registrant has duly caused this Current Report to be signed on its behalf by the undersigned hereunto duly authorized.
Encompass Holdings, Inc., a Nevada corporation
Date: November 14, 2017
/s/ Mark Miller
Mark Miller, President, CEO and sole board member
“ People who look down on other people don't end up being looked up to. ”
— Robert Half
FEATURED Cannabix Technologies and Omega Laboratories Inc. Advance Marijuana Breathalyzer Technology - Dr. Bruce Goldberger to Present at Society of Forensic Toxicologists Conference • Sep 24, 2024 8:50 AM
FEATURED Integrated Ventures, Inc Announces Strategic Partnership For GLP-1 (Semaglutide) Procurement Through MedWell USA, LLC. • Sep 24, 2024 8:45 AM
Avant Technologies Accelerates Creation of AI-Powered Platform to Revolutionize Patient Care • AVAI • Sep 24, 2024 8:00 AM
VHAI - Vocodia Partners with Leading Political Super PACs to Revolutionize Fundraising Efforts • VHAI • Sep 19, 2024 11:48 AM
Dear Cashmere Group Holding Co. AKA Swifty Global Signs Binding Letter of Intent to be Acquired by Signing Day Sports • DRCR • Sep 19, 2024 10:26 AM
HealthLynked Launches Virtual Urgent Care Through Partnership with Lyric Health. • HLYK • Sep 19, 2024 8:00 AM