Great Basin Gold Ltd (GBGJ.J) Related Topics: STOCKSSTOCK SCREENERMARKET DATABASIC MATERIALSGOLD OVERVIEW NEWS KEY DEVELOPMENTS PEOPLE CHARTS FINANCIALS ANALYSTS RESEARCH PULSE GBGJ.J on Johannesburg Stock Exchange 70.00ZAc -- Change (% chg) -- (--) Prev Close 70.00 Open SUMMARY Name Age Since Current Position Ronald Thiessen 64 2005 Independent Chairman of the Board Ray Dombrowski 2012 Chief Executive Officer Patrick Cooke 2012 Interim Chief Financial Officer, Director Peter Gibson 2012 Chief Financial Officer Dana Roets 2011 Chief Operating Officer Willem Beckmann 2012 Vice President - Legal and Compliance Philip Bentley 2010 Vice President - Geology and Exploration Bheki Khumalo 2011 Vice President - Organizational Effectiveness Dawid Mostert 46 2006 Vice President - Human Capital Bernhard Zinkhofer 60 2011 Corporate Secretary Joshua Ngoma 2009 Director T. Barry Coughlan 71 1998 Independent Director Anu Dhir 45 2011 Independent Director Octavia Matloa 40 2011 Independent Director Michael Curlook Head - Investor Relations & Communications» Insider Trading BIOGRAPHIES Name Description Ronald Thiessen Mr. Ronald W. Thiessen is an Independent Chairman of the Board of Great Basin Gold Ltd., since December 6, 2005. He is a Chartered Accountant with professional experience in finance, taxation, mergers, acquisitions and re-organizations. Since 1986, Mr. Thiessen has been involved in the acquisition and financing of mining and mineral exploration companies. Mr. Thiessen is a director of Hunter Dickinson Inc. (“HDI”) and its wholly owned subsidiary, Hunter Dickinson Services Inc. (“HDSI”), a company providing management and administrative services to several publicly-traded companies and focuses on directing corporate development and financing activities. His other directorships includes: Amarc Resources Ltd., Anooraq Resources Corporation, Continental Minerals Corporation, Detour Gold Corporation, Farallon Mining Ltd., Great Basin Gold Ltd., Northern Dynasty Minerals Ltd., Quartz Mountain Resources Ltd., Rockwell Diamonds Inc., Taseko Mines Limited. Ray Dombrowski Patrick Cooke Mr. Patrick Randal Cooke, B.Comm. (Wits), CA (SA), serves as Interim Chief Financial Officer, Director of Great Basin Gold Ltd. He has been appointed as Interim Chief Financial Officer of the Company effective August 16, 2012. Mr. Patrick Cooke received his chartered accountant designation in South Africa in 1981. As a Chartered Accountant he worked as a management consultant with one of the accounting companies as well as working for a merchant bank. Mr. Cooke was responsible for listing two companies on the main board of the Johannesburg Stock Exchange and was the Financial Director of a third JSE listed company. His industry experience is wide, having been involved in mineral resources, information technology, wholesale fast moving consumer goods, financial services and professional services companies. He was appointed a non-executive director of Sallies Limited in October 2009 and, with effect from February 1, 2010, was appointed Financial Director and Chief Operating Officer and with effect from 8 February 2011 was appointed Acting Chief Executive Officer. Effective 1 January 2012 Mr. Cooke resigned from Sallies Limited. Mr. Cooke has been appointed a non-executive director of Anooraq Resources Corporation with effect from 1 January 2012. His other directorships includes: Pangea DiamondFields PLC., Great Basin Gold Ltd., Sallies Ltd., Anooraq Resources Corp. Peter Gibson Dana Roets Mr. Dana Roets is Chief Operating Officer of Great Basin Gold Ltd., since October 3, 2011. Dana Roets is a qualified Mining Engineer and an alumnus of the University of Pretoria (1986), who also holds an MBA through the University of Cape Town (1995). He started his mining career at Gold Fields’ St Helena Gold Mine in the Free State, and then spent two years as Manager Mining and General Manager at the Oryx Gold Mine. He was Managing Director of Kloof Mines before spending four years as Managing Director of Gold Fields’ Free State Mines and Vice President and Head of Operations at Beatrix Gold Mine. Subsequently, he spent a further three years as the Vice President: Technical Services and a year as Vice President and Head of Operations at the Kloof Gold Mine. He was appointed VP Corporate Development with Great Basin Gold in February 2010, before joining Anglo Platinum in mid-2011. He was instrumental in the development and application of Long Hole Stoping as mining method at company's Burnstone operations. Willem Beckmann Mr. Willem J. P. Beckmann serves as Vice President - Legal and Compliance of Great Basin Gold Ltd. He joined Great Basin Gold Limited in 2006 and is responsible for the Company’s legal and compliance, security, risk management and environmental functions. Mr. Beckmann is an accredited attorney, notary and conveyancer. He began his career as an officer in the South African Defence Force, where he gained experience in administrative law, the drafting of legislation and investigatory review techniques. He entered the gold mining industry in 2002 as Group Security Manager at Harmony Gold, before founding the company’s Legal and Compliance Department, overseeing the security, legal and enterprise-wide risk management functions. He obtained his B.Juris LLB from North West University in 1983. Philip Bentley Mr. Philip N. Bentley is Vice President - Geology and Exploration of Great Basin Gold Ltd. He joined Great Basin Gold Limited in September 2008. Mr. Bentley has more than 26 years experience in the mineral exploration and mining sector, gained mostly in sub-Saharan Africa, North and South America, and Australasia. He has operated from South Africa since 1984, working with companies such as Randgold Resources Ltd., Rand Mines / Randgold Exploration, Central African Gold plc, and Metallon Gold Corp. Mr. Bentley specializes in applied geology with respect to gold mineralization systems, as well as core exploration management, orebody evaluation, and project development. His qualifications include an MSc in Economic Geology (Victoria, NZ) and an MSc in Mineral Exploration (Rhodes, RSA). Bheki Khumalo Mr. Bheki Khumalo is Vice President - Organizational Effectiveness of Great Basin Gold Ltd., since October 2011. Mr. Khumalo began his career as a Clinical Psychologist from 1997 to 2003. He then studied for his LLB with the University of South Africa and was thereafter admitted as an attorney. As a practising Attorney he worked for Deneys Reitz now known as Norton Rose Group. He then joined BHP Billiton in 2007 and was later appointed as Executive Director for Hillside Aluminium Limited and Billiton SA Aluminium Limited until he joined Great Basin Gold. He holds a Masters degree in Clinical psychology and an LLB. Dawid Mostert Mr. Dawid J. Mostert is Vice President - Human Capital of Great Basin Gold Ltd., since March 1, 2006. He joined Great Basin Gold Limited as Vice President, Human Capital in March 2006. Mr. Mostert has more than 15 years’ experience in the mining sector. His past positions have included Human Resources Executive and Manager, Mine Manager (Elandsrand), Training and People Development Executive and Employee Relations Executive. In 2002 he was appointed an Executive of Harmony Gold, in which capacity he served on the Boards of The South African Mathematics Foundation and the Mining Qualifications Authority (Mining SETA). Mr. Mostert holds a Diploma in Labour Relations (DPLR) (Advanced Labour Law) and a MBA Degree from Wits University in South Africa. Bernhard Zinkhofer Joshua Ngoma Mr. Joshua C. Ngoma, M.Eng., is a Director of Great Basin Gold Ltd., since July 15, 2009. He is a founding member and the current Chief Executive Officer of Tranter Holdings (Pty) Ltd. He holds a Bachelor of Engineering degree with honours in mining engineering from Camborne School of Mines in the UK and a Master of Engineering in Project Management from Pretoria University in South Africa and has spent most of his career in the mining industry. He served with ZCCM (Zambia Consolidated Copper Mines Ltd), Cementation Mining, De Beers and Sasol Mining before joining Eyesizwe Coal, where he served from Group Technical Manager to General Manager of the Matla Colliery. He later joined Anglo Platinum as the Group Manager: New Mining Technologies, where he was responsible for the development and implementation of the Group’s new mining technologies. His other directorships includes: Great Basin Gold Ltd. T. Barry Coughlan Mr. T. Barry Coughlan is an Independent Director of Great Basin Gold Ltd., since February 1998. Mr. Coughlan isis a self-employed businessman and financier active in the mineral resource business for over the past 30 years and has had global experience in the acquisition, financing, exploration and development of resources projects and publicly traded mining companies. His principal occupation is President and Director of TBC Ventures Ltd., a private investment company, which has participate in the development of resource projects in Canada, the USA, Africa and Mexico, Ireland, Poland and Guatemala. His other directorships includes: Farallon Resources Ltd., Great Basin Gold Ltd., Icon Industries Ltd., Quartz Mountain Resources Ltd., Taseko Mines Limited., Quadro Resources Ltd. (formerlyTri-Gold Resources Corp)., Amarc Resources Ltd., Creso Explorations Inc., Vatic Ventures Corp., Rathdowney Resource Corp.