Wednesday, August 16, 2017 10:02:30 AM
On December 30, 2015, the Board of Directors and the majority of the voting shareholders authorized and approved by same that Raul Santos by installed as a Director and as Chief Executive Officer to the Corporation, effective immediately, and that Christopher Margait did resigns all positions, including, President, Secretary, Treasurer, and Chief Executive Officer, with the Corporation, effective immediately. In conjunction with this change, Chris Margait did agree to transfer all of his common and preferred stock and share ownership interests to Mr. Santos to be done by February 18, 2016.
If they are going through a management change, and in January they increased the A/S from 1.3 billion to 1.999 billion, some of the 699 million is maybe being sold to some new management shareholders at .0003/.0004 range for the last 6 months, possibly one of the new management being John Pinheiro from LATF. Still could be a reverse merger coming here. Back in 2015 in one of the filings, it stated that Lateno Foods had 200,000,000 restricted shares in ARCS and both companies have same legal counsel.
jmo. GO ARCS.
VHAI - Vocodia Partners with Leading Political Super PACs to Revolutionize Fundraising Efforts • VHAI • Sep 19, 2024 11:48 AM
Dear Cashmere Group Holding Co. AKA Swifty Global Signs Binding Letter of Intent to be Acquired by Signing Day Sports • DRCR • Sep 19, 2024 10:26 AM
HealthLynked Launches Virtual Urgent Care Through Partnership with Lyric Health. • HLYK • Sep 19, 2024 8:00 AM
Element79 Gold Corp. Appoints Kevin Arias as Advisor to the Board of Directors, Strengthening Strategic Leadership • ELMGF • Sep 18, 2024 10:29 AM
Mawson Finland Limited Further Expands the Known Mineralized Zones at Rajapalot: Palokas step-out drills 7 metres @ 9.1 g/t gold & 706 ppm cobalt • MFL • Sep 17, 2024 9:02 AM
PickleJar Announces Integration With OptCulture to Deliver Holistic Fan Experiences at Venue Point of Sale • PKLE • Sep 17, 2024 8:00 AM