Tuesday, August 15, 2017 9:23:11 AM
The Company was incorporated on April 14, 2010 in Wyoming. The former business office (virtual office) located at 3651 Lindell Road, Suite D#155, Las Vegas, NV, 89103, which has changed to a physical office location 685 Citadel Drive East - Suite 290, Colorado Springs, CO 80909 as result to resolution(s) entered at the Board of Directors and Shareholder Minutes of Meeting on June 6, 2017 (Exhibit 98.1: Section 9).
The Company’s primary telephone number 702-943-0309 has been changed to 719-466-6699 as result to resolution(s) entered by a majority vote from the Board of Directors and Shareholder Minutes of Meeting on June 6, 2017.
The Company’s primary website and email domain name ‘healthadvanceinc.com’ has been changed to ‘hadvinc.com’ as result to resolution(s) entered at the Board of Directors and Shareholder Minutes of Meeting on June 6, 2017 (Exhibit 98.1: Section 17).
The Company’s founder Jordan Starkman, who served the Company as President, Chairman of the Board of Directors, and Director, has be removed and has been replaced by Dr. Muhammad Mukhtar, Ph.D. who will serve the Company as the (Interim) Secretary, (Non-Voting, Interim) Director, Chief Advisor for Control Stock Committee, and (Acting) Chief Executive Officer until July 31, 2017, or until a permanent replacement for Secretary and President of Company is hired, collectively are results to resolution(s) entered at the Board of Directors and Shareholder Minutes of Meeting on June 6, 2017 (Exhibit 98.1: Section 4,5, 6 and Exhibit 99.1). In addition, Mr. Starkman has been removed as Chairman and replaced by Gregory Shusterman, who was appointed as Vice Chairman in April 2017 and has served as ‘Acting Chairman’ since April 19, 2017 as a result to reason specified in Exhibit Y.
Christian Diesveld, who served the Company as a Director, has be removed and has been replaced by Dr. Hauke Kolster, Ph.D.. who will serve the Company as the (Interim) Vice President (Non-Voting, Interim) Director, collectively are results to resolution(s) entered at the Board of Directors and Shareholder Minutes of Meeting on June 6, 2017 (Exhibit 98.1: Section 8).
In addition, Domenico Pascazi was appointed as a director in March 2011. On February 12, 2013, Mr. Pascazi resigned from his position as a member of the board of directors. Mr. Pascazi’s resignation was not a result of any disagreement with the Company or its executive officers, or any matter relating to the Company’s operations, policies or practices.
Why does The http://OTCMarkets.com fail to update this informaiton and continue to post inaccurate information?
Source: https://www.otcmarkets.com/edgar/GetFilingHtml?FilingID=12227392
FEATURED Element79 Gold Corp. Appoints Kevin Arias as Advisor to the Board of Directors, Strengthening Strategic Leadership • Sep 18, 2024 10:29 AM
Mawson Finland Limited Further Expands the Known Mineralized Zones at Rajapalot: Palokas step-out drills 7 metres @ 9.1 g/t gold & 706 ppm cobalt • MFL • Sep 17, 2024 9:02 AM
PickleJar Announces Integration With OptCulture to Deliver Holistic Fan Experiences at Venue Point of Sale • PKLE • Sep 17, 2024 8:00 AM
North Bay Resources Announces Mt. Vernon Gold Mine Bulk Sample, Sierra County, California • NBRI • Sep 11, 2024 9:15 AM
One World Products Issues Shareholder Update Letter • OWPC • Sep 11, 2024 7:27 AM
Kona Gold Beverage Inc. Reports $1.225 Million in Revenue and $133,000 Net Profit for the Quarter • KGKG • Sep 10, 2024 1:30 PM