Followers | 510 |
Posts | 81939 |
Boards Moderated | 10 |
Alias Born | 07/22/2009 |
Sunday, June 26, 2016 9:20:10 PM
A. STEVEN SAMBLIS has consented to step down as Chief Executive Officer, Chief Financial Officer and President and as a Member of the Board of Directors of the Company.
)It does NOT confirm that SS does NOT OWN the co.)
B. JOE SIRIANNI has consented to act as the new President, CEO, Treasurer and a Member of the Board of Directors of the Company.
BE IT RESOLVED THAT :
1. STEVEN SAMBLIS, has stepped down as Chief Executive Officer, Chief Financial Officer and President and as a Member of the Board of Directors of the Company.
2. JOE SIRIANNI, who has consented to act as a President, Secretary and Treasurer, is appointed as President, Secretary and Treasurer of the Company.
Effective date: January 5, 2016
Who is the OWNER?????
The scam continues-DECEPTION!
FEATURED Element79 Gold Corp. Appoints Kevin Arias as Advisor to the Board of Directors, Strengthening Strategic Leadership • Sep 18, 2024 10:29 AM
HealthLynked Launches Virtual Urgent Care Through Partnership with Lyric Health. • HLYK • Sep 19, 2024 8:00 AM
Mawson Finland Limited Further Expands the Known Mineralized Zones at Rajapalot: Palokas step-out drills 7 metres @ 9.1 g/t gold & 706 ppm cobalt • MFL • Sep 17, 2024 9:02 AM
PickleJar Announces Integration With OptCulture to Deliver Holistic Fan Experiences at Venue Point of Sale • PKLE • Sep 17, 2024 8:00 AM
North Bay Resources Announces Mt. Vernon Gold Mine Bulk Sample, Sierra County, California • NBRI • Sep 11, 2024 9:15 AM
One World Products Issues Shareholder Update Letter • OWPC • Sep 11, 2024 7:27 AM