Tuesday, May 13, 2014 11:45:37 AM
"this is joe canouse former ceo of this company
i resigned last summer when i took another position at Quasar Aerospace (qasp) and sold the control block to a third party
that third party had a merger candidate but subsequently he did not complete the agreement nor merge the candidate he had targeted....for those following the saga..it was dean bradley formerly of quasar and the intended target was mineseeker....
that deal fell through and mineseeker has sinced merged into another shell...since then nothing has happened...the other board members are scott martin and al saavedra
i will contact them and try to update you later"
It would appear then that Scott Martin and Al Saavedra are in control of this shell.
VHAI - Vocodia Partners with Leading Political Super PACs to Revolutionize Fundraising Efforts • VHAI • Sep 19, 2024 11:48 AM
Dear Cashmere Group Holding Co. AKA Swifty Global Signs Binding Letter of Intent to be Acquired by Signing Day Sports • DRCR • Sep 19, 2024 10:26 AM
HealthLynked Launches Virtual Urgent Care Through Partnership with Lyric Health. • HLYK • Sep 19, 2024 8:00 AM
Element79 Gold Corp. Appoints Kevin Arias as Advisor to the Board of Directors, Strengthening Strategic Leadership • ELMGF • Sep 18, 2024 10:29 AM
Mawson Finland Limited Further Expands the Known Mineralized Zones at Rajapalot: Palokas step-out drills 7 metres @ 9.1 g/t gold & 706 ppm cobalt • MFL • Sep 17, 2024 9:02 AM
PickleJar Announces Integration With OptCulture to Deliver Holistic Fan Experiences at Venue Point of Sale • PKLE • Sep 17, 2024 8:00 AM